EP1260990 - A segmented lattice rack to store fuels coming from nuclear reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EQUIPOS NUCLEARES, S.A. Avda. Juan Carlos I, 8 E-39600 Maliano (Cantabria) / ES | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costas de la Pena, Luis Avda. Juan Carlos I, 8 39600 Miliano (Cantabria) / ES | 02 /
Tovar Albillos, Javier Avda. Juan Carlos I, 8 39600 Miliano (Cantabria) / ES | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria Po de la Castellana, 72 - 1o 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02380106.1 | 23.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | ES20010001197 | 24.05.2001 Original published format: ES 200101197 | [2002/48] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260990 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260990 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/07, G21F5/012 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
G21C19/07 (EP,KR,US);
G21F5/012 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Segmentiertes Gittergestell zum Lagern von aus Kernreaktoren stammenden Brennstoffen | [2002/48] | English: | A segmented lattice rack to store fuels coming from nuclear reactors | [2002/48] | French: | Ratellier à casiers segmenté pour stockage du combustible provenant d'un réacteur nucléaire | [2008/48] |
Former [2002/48] | Ratellier à casiers segmenté pour stockage du combustible proventant de réacteur nucléaire | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | IE | 23.05.2009 | LU | 23.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 23.05.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 23.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 23.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
PT | 06.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2433226 (BABCOCK BROWN BOVERI REAKTOR [DE]) [AD] 1,4* page 3; figures 1-5 *; | [DX]US5032348 (BLUM PAUL [FR], et al) [DX] 1,2,5 * column 1, lines 54-68 * * column 3, lines 54-57 * * column 4, lines 13-28 * * column 5, lines 1-6 * * column 5, lines 35-40 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 8 * * column 6, lines 44-51 * * column 6, line 68 - column 7, line 28; figures 4,6,7 * |