EP1317018 - Anti-radar space-filling and/or multilevel chaff dispersers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fractus, S.A. Alcalde Barnils, s/n Edificio Testa, mod. C3 Parque Empresarial Sant Joan Despi 08190 Sant Cugat Del Valles / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Fractus, S.A. Alcalde Barnils, s/n, Edificio Testa, mod. C3, Parque Empresarial Sant Joan Despi 08190 Sant Cugat Del Valles / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puente Baliarda, Carles Alcalde Barnils s/n Ed. Testa mod. C3 Pque. Emp. Sant Joan 08190 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02380242.4 | 27.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | ES20010002675 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: ES 200102675 | [2003/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317018 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1317018 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/14, H01Q15/18 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H01Q15/145 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | H01Q15/14 | Designated contracting states | [2004/44] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Raumfüllendes Anti-Radar und/oder Mehrebenen-Radarstörverteiler | [2003/23] | English: | Anti-radar space-filling and/or multilevel chaff dispersers | [2003/23] | French: | Anti-radar de remplissage de l'espace et/ou dispositifs de distibution de particules de brouillage des niveaux multiples | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1604757 (JUNKERS FLUGZEUG UND MOTORENWERKE AG) [X] 1,4,6-9,16,17 * page 1, line 18 - page 3, line 31; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [AD]US4471358 (GLASSER ALAN [US]) [AD] 1,5 * figure 8 *; | [A]USH1631H (MONTGOMERY JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]WO9706578 (FRACTAL ANTENNA SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US5619205 (JOHNSON RICHARD N [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0036239 | US4471358 | US4597332 | EP0246368 | US4763127 | US4976828 | US5087515 | US5835682 |