EP1248447 - Dynamic translation between data network-based protocol in a data-packet-network and interactive voice response functions of a telephony network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genesys Telecommunications Laboratories, Inc. 11th Floor, 1155 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Genesys Telecommunications Laboratories, Inc. 11th Floor, 1155 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nuestro, Marcialito 26580 Chisholm Court, APT.2 Hayward, CA 94544 / US | [2002/50] |
Former [2002/41] | 01 /
Nuestro, Marcialito 26572 Chisholm Court, No. 4 Hayward, CA 94544 / US | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02400027.5 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010827548 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: US 827548 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248447 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248447 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51, H04M7/00, H04L12/64 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H04M3/493 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04M3/42323 (EP,US);
H04M3/5191 (EP,US);
H04M3/523 (EP,US);
H04M7/0036 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M7/1205 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0045 (EP,US);
H04Q3/64 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6472 (EP,US);
H04M2207/12 (EP,US);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US);
H04M3/5183 (EP,US);
H04M3/58 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13072 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | H04M3/51, H04M3/493, H04M7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/01] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Übersetzung von einem Datennetzwerkbasierten Protokoll in einem Datenpaketnetzwerk in interaktiven Sprachantwortfunktionen von einem Fernsprechnetzwerk | [2002/41] | English: | Dynamic translation between data network-based protocol in a data-packet-network and interactive voice response functions of a telephony network | [2002/41] | French: | Traduction dynamique entre un protocole basé sur un réseau de données dans un réseau de données en mode paquets et des fonctions de réponse vocale interactives d'un réseau téléphonique | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 08.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 28.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.03.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9857501 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]US6011844 (UPPALURU PREM [US], et al) [A] 1-33* the whole document *; | [X]WO0028702 (GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10-19,22-32 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 20 *; | [A]US6195357 (POLCYN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document * |