EP1233278 - Device for diagnosing a generator with mounted rotor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Alstom (Switzerland) Ltd Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häusermann, Peter Ammerswilerstrasse 3 5605 Dottikon / CH | 02 /
Kirchhoff, Ingo Haldenstrasse 24 5454 Bellikon / CH | 03 /
Mark, Bernhard Konstanzerstrasse 1 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | 04 /
Stutz, Peter Erlenweg 8 5611 Anglikon / CH | [2006/41] |
Former [2002/34] | 01 /
Häusermann, Peter Ammerswilerstrasse 3 5605 Dottikon / CH | ||
02 /
Kirchhoff, Ingo Döltschihalde 35 8055 Zürich / CH | |||
03 /
Mark, Bernhard Konstanzerstrasse 1 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | |||
04 /
Stutz, Peter Erlenweg 8 5611 Anglikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 02405046.0 | 28.01.2002 | [2002/34] | Priority number, date | DE2001107401 | 14.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10107401 | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1233278 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1233278 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233278 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/34 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G01R31/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Generatordiagnose bei eingebautem Rotor | [2002/34] | English: | Device for diagnosing a generator with mounted rotor | [2002/34] | French: | Dispositif de diagnostic d'un générateur à rotor monté | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Request for further processing for: | 17.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03261351 ; | [AX]US4901572 (SUYAMA TOSHIMITSU [JP]) [A] 3,11 * column 2, line 18 - line 25 * * column 10, paragraph 3 * * column 11, line 4 - line 9 * * figures 1,2,21-23 * [X] 1,12; | [AX]US5252927 (BRUEHLMEIER PAUL [CH], et al) [A] 3 * column 2, line 17 - line 23; figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 17 - line 30 * [X] 1,12; | [YAX]EP0684483 (ANSALDO ENERGIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 4 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 11 - line 29 * * column 3, line 46 - line 57 * * column 4, paragraph 4 * * column 5, paragraphs 6-8 * [A] 11 [X] 1,2,12; | [AX]US6100711 (HATLEY KENNETH J [US]) [A] 9 * column 1, paragraph 6 * * column 2, line 53 - line 64; figures 1,2 *[X] 1,2,6,7,12 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 067, Database accession no. (E - 1168), & JP03261351 A 19911121 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 4 |