EP1344580 - Method and plant for producing a texturized aluminium strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pont, Rene-Pierre Pre-de-Savioz 4 3977 Granges / CH | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 02405193.0 | 12.03.2002 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344580 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/22, B21B13/14, B21B31/02 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B21B13/147 (EP,US);
B21B1/22 (KR);
B21B1/227 (EP,US);
B21B13/14 (KR);
B21B31/02 (EP,KR,US);
B21B1/28 (EP,US);
B21B2003/001 (EP,US);
B21B2013/021 (EP,US);
B21B2013/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/24] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung eines Aluminiumbandes mit texturierter Oberfläche | [2003/38] | English: | Method and plant for producing a texturized aluminium strip | [2003/38] | French: | Procédé et installation de production d'une bande d'aluminium texturée | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.04.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06262203 ; | [A]EP0945198 (HUNTER DOUGLAS IND BV [NL]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0011] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941214), vol. 018, no. 663, Database accession no. (M - 1723), & JP06262203 A 19940920 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |