EP1269991 - Composition for topical use based on the ethylic ester of linoleic acid and on the triethyl ester of citric acid associated with suitable synergists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Paoli Ambrosi, Gianfranco 32, Via Cure del Lino 25087 Salo' (Brescia) / IT | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/45] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/01] | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425243.9 | 18.04.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | IT2001BS00046 | 20.06.2001 Original published format: IT BS20010046 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269991 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1269991 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K31/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/06] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Topische Zusammensetzung die Ethyllinoleat und/oder Triethylzitrat mit Synergisten | [2003/01] | English: | Composition for topical use based on the ethylic ester of linoleic acid and on the triethyl ester of citric acid associated with suitable synergists | [2003/01] | French: | Composition topique contenant de linoléate d'éthyle et/ou citrate de triéthyle avec des composants synergiques | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2452119 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1,3,5-7,9 * examples 1,2,4,5 *; | JPH01110610 [ ] (LION CORP); | [X]WO9929335 (CHONG KUN DANG CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * examples 4A,4E *; | [X] - TOYONO, YASUYUKI ET AL, "Prophylactic antiacne agents containing linoleic acid derivatives", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 111:239549 CA, URL: STN, XP002273218 [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * abstract * |