EP1357041 - An apparatus for bringing bottles to a desired temperature in a bottling plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cames snc di Colla G. & Sardi G. Loc. San Grato 2/A 12058 S. Stefano Belbo (Cuneo) / IT | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sardi, Giovanni Viale Indipendenza No. 118 14053 Canelli (AT) / IT | 02 /
Colla, Giovanni Loc. San Grato No. 3/A 12058 S. Stefano Belbo (CN) / IT | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2003/44] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al INTERPATENT S.R.L., Via Caboto No.35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425270.2 | 26.04.2002 | [2003/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357041 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/00 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B67C7/00 (EP);
B65C9/0015 (EP);
B65C2009/0059 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erwärmen, bzw. Abkühlen, auf eine gegebene Temperatur von Flaschen in einer Abfüllanlage | [2003/44] | English: | An apparatus for bringing bottles to a desired temperature in a bottling plant | [2003/44] | French: | Dispositif pour porter des bouteilles à une température donnée dans une installation d'embouteillage | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3873264 (DAUGHERTY BARNEY R, et al) [X] 1,17 * figure -; claims 1-9 *; | [X]DE4427870 (ALFILL GETRAENKETECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]EP1028300 (CAMES SNC DI COLLA G & SARDI G [IT]) [X] 1-3,14,17-19 * the whole document * |