EP1389592 - A device for conveying stacks of sheets of paper or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pemco, Inc. 3333 Crocker Avenue Sheboygan WI 53082-1146 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Innopack S.r.l. Via San Vitalino, 7 40012 Calderara di Reno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cinotti, Andrea Via Gaspare Tagliacozzi 5 40141 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Schiavina, Luca Via Zanardi 389/16 40131 Bologna / IT | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/08] | 01 /
Conotti, Andrea Via Gaspare Tagliacozzi 5 40141 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
Schiavina, Luca Via Zanardi 389/16 40131 Bologna / IT | Representative(s) | Mayer, Hans Benno, et al de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Mayer, Hans Benno, et al de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/08] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425528.3 | 13.08.2002 | [2004/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389592 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1389592 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/26, B65B25/14 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
B65G17/26 (EP,US);
B65B25/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Bogenstapeln aus Papier oder dergleichen | [2004/08] | English: | A device for conveying stacks of sheets of paper or the like | [2004/08] | French: | Dispositif de transport de piles de feuilles de papier ou similaire | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0373331 (PEMCO [US]); | [A]EP0515320 (WRAPMATIC SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4,7,10 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1227040 (INNOPACK S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,7,10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1,2 * |