EP1418064 - Method for manufacturing a spoked wheel for bicycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Campagnolo S.r.l. Via della Chimica, 4 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Campagnolo Srl Via della Chimica, 4 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meggiolan, Mario via Mazzini, 34 36051 Creazzo (Vicenza) / IT | 02 /
Passarotto, Maurizio via Spola 2/A 45100 Rovigo / IT | [2006/19] |
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
Meggiolan, Mario via Buonarroti 26 36051 Creazzo (Vicenza) / IT | ||
02 /
Passarotto, Maurizio via Spola 2/A 45100 Rovigo / IT | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425686.9 | 08.11.2002 | [2004/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418064 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418064 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60B21/06, B60B1/04 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
B60B21/062 (EP,US);
B60B1/0215 (EP,US);
B60B1/041 (EP,US);
B60B1/042 (EP,US);
B60B1/044 (EP,US);
B60B1/045 (EP,US);
B60B21/025 (EP,US);
B60B21/04 (EP,US);
B60B21/068 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49492 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49506 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49512 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49515 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49517 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49524 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | RO | 29.10.2004 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Speichenrads für Fahrräder | [2004/20] | English: | Method for manufacturing a spoked wheel for bicycles | [2004/20] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une roue à rayons pour bicyclettes | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | LU | 08.11.2008 | IE | 10.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
LU | 08.11.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 10.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 26.03.2008 | |
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 26.03.2008 | |
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 26.03.2008 | |
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 26.03.2008 | |
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 26.03.2008 | |
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4127500 (F.W. BRÖKELMANN ALUMINIUMWERK GMBH) [X] 33-36 * column 1, line 34 - column 1, line 43 ** abstract *; | [XA]DE4444044 (HASBERG JOSEF DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,21,27,29-32 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 24 * * column 9, line 41 - column 9, line 46 * * abstract * [A] 49 | by applicant | EP0896886 | US5975646 | EP1101631 | EP1167078 | US2002019222 | EP1231077 |