EP1424771 - Cascode power amplifier particularly for use in radiofrequency applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murari, Bruno Via Ardigò, 1 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Moscatelli, Alessandro Via Bixio, 50 22100 Como / IT | 03 /
Labate, Lorenzo Via Pisani Dossi, 37 20080 Albairate (Milano) / IT | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425729.7 | 28.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424771 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/22 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
H03F1/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kaskoden-Leistungsverstärker insbesondere für HF-Anwendungen | [2004/23] | English: | Cascode power amplifier particularly for use in radiofrequency applications | [2004/23] | French: | Amplificateur cascode de puissance utilisé notamment dans le cadre des applications à radiofréquence | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0657995 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 2; figure 3 *; | [X]US5463347 (JONES STEVEN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 46; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0790703 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 10, line 12 - column 12, line 43; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US6353345 (YUSHAN LI [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 56; figure 4 *; | [A]DE10114935 (ALPHA MICROELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 42; figure 2 *; | [A] - HONG M Y, SIMULATION AND FABRICATION OF SUBMICRON CHANNEL LENGTH DMOS TRANSISTORS FOR ANALOG APPLICATIONS, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 40, NR. 12, PAGE(S) 2222-2230, ISSN 0018-9383, XP000541407 [A] 1-6 * page 2229, column L, line 12 - page 2230, column L, line 40; figure 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.249469 |