EP1424478 - Hardware architecture of an automatic system for driving injector of an internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Cola, Eusebio Via Olimpia, 12 98168 Messima / IT | 02 /
Rivoli, Federico Contrada Conte, Coop. Garofano, scala 2H 98168 Messina / IT | 03 /
Ticli, Lucio Via Duca degli Abruzzi, 46/A 95037 San Giovanni la Punta (Catania) / IT | 04 /
Martorana, Rosario Via Industriale, Isolato L, 61 98123 Messina / IT | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425732.1 | 28.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424478 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/26, F02D41/22 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
F02D41/3005 (EP);
F02D41/22 (EP);
F02D41/266 (EP);
F02D2041/1411 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hardware-Architektur eines automatischen Systems zur Ansteuerung eines Injektors einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/23] | English: | Hardware architecture of an automatic system for driving injector of an internal combustion engines | [2004/23] | French: | Architecture d'un système automatique pour actionner un injecteur d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4100751 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [Y] 5 * column A * * column 4, line 17 - line 43 *; | [A]US5201296 (WUNNING JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * * column 8, line 14 - line 61 *; | [A]US5233964 (JAMOUA SAAD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 16 - column 9, line 54 *; | [XY]US5829412 (KLATT ROLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column A * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 15 * * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 16 * [Y] 5; | [A]DE10041448 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1* column W * | by applicant | EP1830645 |