EP1424773 - Circuit device for realising a non-linear reactive elements scale network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radice, Francesco Via Per Senna, 21 22070 Capiago Intimiano (Como) / IT | 02 /
Bruccoleri, Melchiorre Via Matteotti, 77 20017 Rho (Milano) / IT | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425734.7 | 28.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424773 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424773 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/04, H03H11/48 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
H03H11/0405 (EP,US);
H03H11/481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsvorrichtung zur Herstellung eines nicht-lineares Skaliernetzwerks mit reaktiven Elementen | [2006/35] | English: | Circuit device for realising a non-linear reactive elements scale network | [2004/23] | French: | Circuit pour réaliser un circuit d'échelle non-linéaire comportant des éléments réactifs | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/23] | Schaltungsvorrichtung zur Herstellung eines nicht-lineares Skaliernetzwerk mit reaktiven Elementen | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 25.04.2007 | [2008/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002011895 (KUO TIMOTHY C [US]) [A] 1,3,7* the whole document *; | [A] - D.T. BICKLEY, "design of nonlinear networks using gyrators", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., IEE STEVENAGE., GB, (196711), vol. 3, no. 11, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 519 - 521, XP002241390 [A] 1 * the whole document * |