EP1325747 - Dietary supplement for neuropaths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Health Pharma S.r.l Via della Vittoria 47 20025 Legnano MI / IT | [2003/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucchina, Franco Via Valle Olona 25 21052 Busto Arsizio VA / IT | 02 /
Terruzzi, Franco Via Meyer 11 20040 Briosco MI / IT | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Montelatici, Linda Anna, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Montelatici, Linda Anna, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/28] | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02425786.7 | 19.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02732 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012732 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325747 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1325747 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325747 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/555, A61K31/381, A61K31/202, A61K31/198, A61K31/375, A61K31/355, A61K31/51, A61K31/525, A61K31/44, A61K31/714, A23L1/29, A61P25/02 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A23L33/12 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A61K31/202 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K31/375 (EP);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/51 (EP);
A61K31/525 (EP);
A61K31/555 (EP);
A61K31/714 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/381, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2003/31] | A61K31/555, A61K31/381, A61K31/202, A61K31/198, A61K31/375, A61K31/355, A61K31/51, A61K31/525, A61K31/44, A61K31/714, A23L1/29 | ||
Former IPC [2003/28] | A61K31/555, A61K31/381, A61K31/202, A61K31/198, A61K31/375, A61K31/355, A61K31/51, A61K31/525, A61K31/44, A61K31/714, A61K45/06, A23L1/29, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/28] | Title | German: | Diätergänzung für neuropatischen Patienten | [2003/28] | English: | Dietary supplement for neuropaths | [2003/28] | French: | Supplement diététique pour patients neuropathiques | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Laboratorio Chimico Internazionale SpA Via Salvini 10 20122 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Trupiano, Federica, et al, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Laboratorio Chimico Internazionale SpA Via Salvini 10 20122 Milano / IT Opponent's representative Trupiano, Federica, et al, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | 12.06.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.10.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/22] | Appeal following opposition | 13.01.2011 | Appeal received No. T0203/11 | 16.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 19.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | IE | 19.12.2008 | LU | 19.12.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | AT | 19.12.2011 | GB | 19.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | NL | 01.07.2012 | DE | 03.07.2012 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/47] | CY | 30.07.2008 | |
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 30.07.2008 | |
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 30.07.2008 | |
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
LU | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IE | 19.12.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5292538 (PAUL STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 6, line 35 - column 9, line 28 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 39 *; | [X]WO9833494 (KOSBAB JOHN V [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * page 11, line 12 - page 13, line 17 * * page 22, lines 11-29 * * page 24, lines 31-37 * * page 29, lines 12-18 * * page 31, line 22 - page 32, line 10 * * page 33, lines 19-25; claim - *; | [X]WO9841113 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document, especially page 5, line 19 to page 6, line 12, claims *; | [X]US5895652 (GIAMPAPA VINCENT C [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5922704 (BLAND JEFFREY [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7-9 * example - *; | [X]US5962030 (FINE STUART A [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column 9, line 10 - column 10, line 35 *; | [X]US5976568 (RILEY PATRICIA A [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * the whole document, particularly column 6, line 40-62, tables II and III, claims *; | [A]WO9961038 (ADAMS FOOD LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]WO0037087 (TODAY INC 4 [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * page 11, line 1 - page 20, line 10; example -; claim - *; | [PX]US2002182196 (MCCLEARY EDWARD LARRY [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document especially the table on page 11 and the claims * |