EP1431639 - Valve with integrated actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techspace Aero S.A. Route de Liers, 121 4041 Herstal / BE | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delobel, Pierre Avenue des Cerfs 17 4031 Angleur / BE | 02 /
Defloo, Yves Aimé Georges Ghislain Rue du Sart Tilman, 282 4031 Angleur / BE | 03 /
Servais, Thomas Hugues Benoit Avenue Maurice Maeterlinck, 8, boîte 2 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2006/01] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Pronovem, et al Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | pronovem, et al Office Van Malderen Boulevard de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2007/25] | pronovem, et al OFFICE VAN MALDEREN Bd. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Bd. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 02447261.5 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431639 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431639 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/126, F16K41/10, F16K1/12 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F16K1/126 (EP,US);
F16K31/1262 (EP,US);
F16K41/103 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ventil mit integriertem Antrieb | [2004/26] | English: | Valve with integrated actuator | [2004/26] | French: | Vanne à actionneur intégré | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH373935 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 64 - page 2, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US3637187 (BURGER MANFRED) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 66 - column 5, line 12; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]DE2553163 (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [AY]DE3800807 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * figure 1 * [Y] 6; | [A]FR2675237 (RUDOLPH TUYAUX FLEXIBLES [FR]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 3, lines 13-23 *; | [A]EP0750148 (FUJIKIN KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figure 1 *; | [AY]EP0786534 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, lines 3-5 * [Y] 7; | [A]DE19825574 (EVERTZ HYDROTECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,8* figures 1,2 * |