EP1243195 - Ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hackl, Oswald Weinberggasse 58 7011 Zagersdorf / AT | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02450065.4 | 19.03.2002 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | AT20010000206U | 20.03.2001 Original published format: AT 20601 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2002/39] | AT20010020620U | 20.03.2001 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243195 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243195 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A44C9/00, A44C17/02 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
A44C17/02 (EP);
A44C9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Schmuckring | [2002/39] | English: | Ring | [2002/39] | French: | Bague | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US1383104 (GROSSMAN HARRISON R) [DA] 1,2* figures 2,5; claim 1 *; | [YX]GB1200257 (W J PELLOW LTD) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 8 - line 22; figure 1 * [X] 2; | [Y]US4077536 (BRANDTBERG KAI) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 14 - line 33; figure 5 * |