EP1285580 - Attractant for female pests which are damaging to chestnuts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/09] | Chemical composition comprising at least one ingredient from a plant of the genus Aesculus as attractant for pests which are damaging to chestnuts | ||
[2006/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calantis Infochemicals GmbH Linzerstrasse 410 1140 Wien / AT | [2005/03] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Innovationsagentur Gesellschaft m.b.H. Taborstrasse 10 1020 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Harand, Wolfgang Maurer Langegasse 136/16/3 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harand, Wolfgang Maurer Langegasse 136/16/3 1230 Wien / AT | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Matschnig, Franz, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Siebensterngasse 54, Postfach 252 1071 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2003/09] | Pawloy, Peter Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Köhler-Pavlik Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02450178.5 | 21.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | AT20010001328 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: AT 13282001 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285580 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A01N65/08 (EP);
A01N65/00 (EP);
A01N65/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | SI | 25.08.2003 | Title | German: | Lockstoff für weibliche Kastanienschädlinge | [2006/14] | English: | Attractant for female pests which are damaging to chestnuts | [2006/13] | French: | Agent attractif pour les parasites femelles de châtaignes | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/09] | Zumindest einen Pflanzeninhaltsstoff der Gattung Aesculus umfassende chemische Zusammensetzung als Lockstoff für Kastanienschädlinge | ||
Former [2003/09] | Chemical composition comprising at least one ingredient from a plant of the genus Aesculus as attractant for pests which are damaging to chestnuts | ||
Former [2003/09] | Composition chimique comprenant au moins un ingrédient d'une plante du genre Aesculus comme agent attractif pour les parasites de châtaignes | Examination procedure | 25.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2006 | 27.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5308613 (BANFIELD MICHAEL G [US]) [DA] 1-17* column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 19 *; | [DA]WO0100553 (USTAV ORGANICKE CHEMIE A BIOCH [CZ]) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X] - G.ROTUNDO ET AL., "Identification of volatiles from leaves of Castanea sativa Miller and electroantennogram responses of Cydia splendana Hubn. (Lep. Tortricidae)", CAB, CAB INTERNATIONAL, WALLINGFORD, OXON, GB, Database accession no. 89:44073 CABA, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002221983 [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11,14 * abstract * | [X] - DEN OTTER C J ET AL, "Electrophysiological and behavioural responses of chestnut moths, Cydia fagiglandana and C. splendana (Lep., Tortricidae), to sex attractants and odours of host plants.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199699239685, XP002221984 [X] 1,4,5,8,11,13,14,16 * abstract * | [A] - SKUHRAVY VON V, "View of knowledge about the horse chestnut miner Cameraria ohridella Desch. & Dem. (Lep., Gracillariidae).", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199908), Database accession no. PREV199900452015, XP002221985 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [ ] - ANNALI DELLA FACOLTA DI SCIENZE AGRARIE DELLA UNIVERSITA DEGLI STUDI DI NAPOLI, PORTICI, IV, (1987), vol. 21, pages 20 - 38 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED ENTOMOLOGY, (1996), vol. 120, no. 7, ISSN 0931-2048, pages 413 - 421 | [ ] - ANZEIGER FUER SCHAEDLINGSKUNDE, (199908), vol. 72, no. 4, ISSN 1436-5693, pages 95 - 99 |