EP1377902 - MULTI-FUNCTIONAL APPLICATION LAUNCHER WITH INTEGRATED STATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | For:LU
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
For:LU
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECTION, David, B. 8008 Looking Glass Court Raleigh, NC 27612 / US | 02 /
MOLANDER, Mark, E. 301 New Rail Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | 03 /
SCANLON, John, L. 8625 Valley Brook Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Klein, Hans-Jörg IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Klein, Hans-Jörg IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Klein, Hans-Jörg IBM Deutschland GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700213.8 | 06.02.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002EP01203 | Priority number, date | US20010794641 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: US 794641 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02073457 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377902 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377902 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLER APPLIKATIONS-LAUNCHER MIT INTEGRIERTEM STATUS | [2004/02] | English: | MULTI-FUNCTIONAL APPLICATION LAUNCHER WITH INTEGRATED STATUS | [2004/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE LANCEMENT D'APPLICATION MULTIFONCTION A ETAT INTEGRE | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | BE | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | IT | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | CY | 06.02.2005 | LU | 06.02.2005 | IE | 07.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IT | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
CY | 06.02.2005 | ||
LU | 06.02.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
CY | 06.02.2005 | ||
LU | 06.02.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
LU | 06.02.2005 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
IE | 07.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4845644 (ANTHIAS TEFCROS [GB], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,7,12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 2 * * column 9, line 55 - column 10, line 14 *; | [Y] - BILLARD E A ET AL, "A GUI FOR A MANAGER OF LIGHTWEIGHT PROCESSES", SOFTWARE ENGINEERING NOTES, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19951201), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 0163-5948, pages 48 - 50, XP000551767 [Y] 1,3,4,7,12-14 * page 17, line 42 - page 18, line 18 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/217030.217038 | [A] - FRIEDMANN M, "TOOLS FOR WINDOWS NT PERFORMANCE MONITORING", APACITY MANAGE. REV. (USA), CAPACITY MANAGEMENT REVIEW, USA, (199611), vol. 24, no. 12, ISSN 1049-2194, pages 17 - 30, XP009009013 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * | [A] - MEI-LING HSU ET AL, "Building soft real-time monitors based on software reuse", ENGINEERING OF COMPLEX COMPUTER SYSTEMS, 1998. ICECCS '98. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTEREY, CA, USA 10-14 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980810), ISBN 0-8186-8597-2, pages 55 - 66, XP010297234 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECCS.1998.706656 |