EP1368562 - Cylinder - crankcase of a liquid cooled internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/50] | ZYLINDERKURBELGEHÄUSE FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | ||
[2006/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLIERL, Rudolf Rauhweid 13 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
WOLF, Johann Beethovenstrasse 17 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 03 /
GIBISCH, Rudolf Fastlinger Ring 116 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [2006/45] |
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
FLIERL, Rudolf Rauhweid 13 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | ||
02 /
WOLF, Johann Beethovenstrasse 17 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | |||
03 /
GIBISCH, Rudolf Fastlinger Ring 116 85716 Unterschlei heim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700217.9 | 08.02.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002EP01313 | Priority number, date | DE2001112132 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112132 | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02073021 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368562 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368562 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00, F02F1/10, B22D19/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
B22D19/0009 (EP,US);
F02F1/108 (EP,US);
F02F7/0007 (EP,US);
F02F7/0085 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1824 (EP,US);
F02F2001/104 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zylinderkurbelgehäuse für eine flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine | [2003/50] | English: | Cylinder - crankcase of a liquid cooled internal combustion engine | [2006/45] | French: | Carter-cylindres pour moteur à refroidissement à eau | [2006/45] |
Former [2003/50] | ZYLINDERKURBELGEHÄUSE FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | ||
Former [2003/50] | CARTER-CYLINDRES POUR MOTEUR A REFROIDISSEMENT A EAU | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 13.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE4306269 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0659899 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1,2 ** claims 1-21 *; | [AD]DE4409750 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [AD]DE19540763 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * claims 1-15 *; | [AD]EP0751289 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US5771955 (HELGESEN GARY DALE [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-5 * * column A * * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US6192852 (GERHARDS INGO [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * * column A * * claims 1-17 *; | [A]DE10026216 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * abstract * * claims 1-9 * | by applicant | DE4306269 | DE4409750 | DE19540763 | EP0751289 |