EP1362904 - WATER-BASED WATER REPELLANT FOR TREATMENT OF SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Forestry Co., Ltd 7-28 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sumitomo Forestry Co., Ltd 7-28 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsumura, Kazuyuki 1-10, Oaza Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | |||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsumura, Kazuyuki 1-10, Oaza Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Kazuyuki 1-10, Oaza Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Akira 1-10, Oaza Hitomi, Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma 379-0224 / JP | 03 /
SUDA, Hisayoshi, Sumitomo Forestry Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 04 /
KADOTA, Kenichi, Sumitomo Forestry Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700677.4 | 21.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002JP01560 | Priority number, date | JP20010046573 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001046573 | JP20010385932 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001385932 | [2003/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02068558 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362904 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362904 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, B32B21/08, B27K3/50, C08L83/04 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US);
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
C09K3/18 (US);
B27K3/15 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31989 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/08, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/47] | C09K3/18, B32B21/08, B27K3/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2009/33] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | WASSERBASIERENDES HYDROPHOBIERMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SUBSTRATEN | [2003/47] | English: | WATER-BASED WATER REPELLANT FOR TREATMENT OF SUBSTRATES | [2003/47] | French: | AGENT HYDROFUGE AQUEUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRATS | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2003 | Translation filed | 16.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE Opponent's representative polypatent, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE Opponent's representative Polypatent, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 26.07.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.10.2010 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.2010 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2012 | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 20.10.2012 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2013/09] | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.02.2011 | GB | 21.02.2011 | SE | 22.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | DE | 01.09.2011 | [2015/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11165303 ; | [Y]JPH05237813 ; | [Y]JPH11226918 ; | [XY]US5226954 (SUZUKI TAKEHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-9,11-18 * example 13; claim 9; table 3 * [Y] 10,11,19-22; | [XY]US5661196 (MAYER HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11-18 * column 3, line 3; examples 1,2 * [Y] 10,11,19-22 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11165303 A 19990622 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931217), vol. 0176, no. 94, Database accession no. (M - 1531), & JP5237813 A 19930917 (CHEMICOAT & CO LTD) [Y] 19,20 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11226918 A 19990824 (EIDAI CO LTD) [Y] 21,22 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5226954 (SUZUKI TAKEHIRO [JP]); | [Y]JPH05237813 (CHEMICOAT KK); | [Y]JPH0959116 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [X]US5661196 (MAYER HANS [DE], et al); | [Y]JPH11165303 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [Y]JPH11178463 (YAMATOYA KK, et al); | [Y]JPH11226918 (EIDAI CO LTD); | [X]JPH11322945 (GE TOSHIBA SILICONE KK); | [A]JP2000095868 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) | by applicant | US5226954 | US5661196 |