EP1364660 - DRUG-RELEASING SYSTEM OF BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | For all designated states Tojo, Kakuji 781-304, Ooazakoubukuro, Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-0066 / JP | [2010/51] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tojo, Kakuji 781-304, Ooazakoubukuro, Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-0066 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOJO, Kakuji 781-304, Ooazakoubukuro Iizuka-shi, Fukuoka 820-0066 / JP | 02 /
FUJIKAWA, Yoshiko Ikejiri Amino Residence 306, 2-26-5 Ikejiri, Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 154-0001 / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/48] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700689.9 | 21.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002JP01577 | Priority number, date | JP20010053035 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001053035 | [2003/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02067993 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364660 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364660 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/34, A61K9/00, A61K9/14, A61K45/00, A61K39/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P9/00, A61P27/06, A61P27/02, A61P35/00 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/204 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM AUS EINEM BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN POLYMER | [2003/48] | English: | DRUG-RELEASING SYSTEM OF BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER TYPE | [2003/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE LIBERATION DE MEDICAMENT DE TYPE POLYMERE BIODEGRADABLE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2003 | Translation filed | 20.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | IE | 21.02.2011 | LU | 21.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS58216117 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH0418035 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH11286439 (SENJU PHARMA CO); | [A] - ASANO MASAHARU ET AL., "Yakubutsu no butsuri teki bunsan kozo o i nisiru seitai bunkai gata kopori (DL-alanine/beta-ethyl L-aspartate) fukugotai no chosei to soreno in vivo tokusei", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, JAPAN, (19890620), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 116 - 126, XP002952615 | Examination | - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US |