EP1364928 - HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2018/42] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Kenji, @c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Katsuhiro, @c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Shinji, @c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Hiroaki, @c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2018/42] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Kenji, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
INOUE, Katsuhiro, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASAKI, Shinji, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKAI, Hiroaki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2003/48] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02700750.9 | 25.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002JP01672 | Priority number, date | JP20010057608 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001057608 | [2003/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070433 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364928 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364928 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, C04B35/195, B01J35/04, B01D39/20, B01D53/88, B01D53/94, B01J27/224, C04B35/63, C04B35/636, C04B35/638, C04B38/00, F01N3/28, F01N3/028, B01D46/24, F01N3/022 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01D39/2075 (EP,US);
B01D46/2418 (EP,US);
B01D53/885 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (EP,US);
B01J27/224 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/6316 (EP,US);
C04B35/6365 (EP,US);
C04B35/638 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3873 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/668 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9684 (EP,US);
F01N2330/30 (EP,US);
F01N2370/22 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24744 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B20/0076, C04B35/195, C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195, C04B35/565 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2003/48] | C04B35/565, C04B35/195, B01J35/04, B01D39/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [2018/42] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | WABENFÖRMIGE STRUKTUR | [2003/48] | English: | HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2003/48] | French: | STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLES | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2002 | Translation filed | 12.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | [2020/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1978691 (PHELPS STUART M) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4976760 (HELFERICH RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 1 * example 6 *; | [A]EP1070687 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0024] *; | [E]WO03051488 (CORNING INC [US]) [E] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0016] - [0020] - [0022] , [0023] , [0025] * * table II *; | [E]EP1375454 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * example 5; table 1 ** paragraph [0075] * | International search | [Y]JPS60186462 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JPH05213665 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09183658 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) |