EP1360193 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING THE HELICOBACTER ADHESIN-LIKE PROTEIN A (ALPA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mérieux Oravax 58, Avenue Leclerc 69007 Lyon / FR | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOURRICHON, Laurence 61, rue de l'Ancienne Poste F-69480 Lucenay / FR | 02 /
LISSOLO, Ling 691, rue du Vallon F-69280 Marcy L'Etoile / FR | 03 /
PITIOT, Olivier 3, allée de Val Fontaine F-69290 Saint Genis les Ollières / FR | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Ayroles, Marie-Pauline, et al Sanofi Pasteur Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69367 Lyon cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Ayroles, Marie-Pauline, et al Aventis Pasteur Propriété Intellectuelle 2, avenue pont Pasteur F-69367 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02701347.3 | 30.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002FR00355 | Priority number, date | FR20010001499 | 05.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0101499 | [2003/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02064622 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360193 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/16, C07K14/205 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
C07K14/205 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG DES ADHESIN-LIKE PROTEINS A (ALPA) AUS HELICOBACTER | [2003/46] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFYING THE HELICOBACTER ADHESIN-LIKE PROTEIN A (ALPA) | [2003/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE LA PROTEINE ADHESINE-LIKE A (ALPA) D'HELICOBACTER | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 18.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9641880 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al); | [A]FR2748478 (PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS VACC [FR]); | [A]US6086893 (DUPUY MONIQUE [FR], et al); | [A]US6096521 (HAAS RAINER [DE], et al); |