EP1355871 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF 1,3-DIKETONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Roche Vitamins AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRATER, Georg 61 Turmstrasse CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
HUBER, Ulrich 12 Foehrenstrasse CH-8703 Erlenbach / CH | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Schwander, Kuno, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Patent Department VMD Bau 241 / 636 P.O. Box 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Schwander, Kuno Josef, Dr., et al DSM Nutritional Products AG Patent Department VMD Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2004/52] | Steck, Melanie, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd. Patent Department VMD Bau 241/636 P.O.Box 3255 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/44] | Best, Michael, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702306.8 | 24.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002EP00697 | Priority number, date | EP20010102396 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: EP 01102396 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02062738 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355871 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/77, C07C45/85, C07C49/92, C07C49/84 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
C07F5/022 (EP,US);
C07C45/77 (KR);
C07C45/455 (EP,US);
C07C45/85 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/455, C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C45/85, C07C49/84 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON 1,3-DIKETONEN | [2003/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF 1,3-DIKETONES | [2003/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DES 1,3-DICETONES | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3919275 (ROTHMAN EDWARD S, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 30 - line 33 * * column 1, line 50 - line 53; example 1 *; | [A]US3742062 (CHAPPELOW C, et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 4, line 62 - line 65; claim 1 *; | [A]GB869988 (ICI LTD) [A] 1 * page 3, column L, line 51 - column R, line 63; example 1 *; | [A]GB868106 (DESPIC ALEKSANDAR, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, column R, line 64 - line 76 * * page 2, column L, line 41 - line 56; example - *; | [A]US2401335 (SEYMOUR CALDER DOUGLAS, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document, claim 1 *; | [X] - YUAN L. CHOW, "Spectroscopic and Electrochemical Properties of 1,3-diketonatoboron Derivatives", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 9, pages 7 - 16, XP001079198 [X] 10 * page 2 * * see table of p.2 last entry * * page 9; table 1 * * page 13, column L * * last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1395(199601)9:1<7::AID-POC747>3.0.CO;2-H |