EP1458376 - DARIFENACIN FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF URGENCY INDUCED BY OVERACTIVE BLADDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd. Hurst Holme, 12 Trott Road Hamilton HM 11 / BM | [2006/40] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd. Hurst Holme, 12 Trott Road Hamilton HM 11 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLI, Enrico Piazza Pertini 9 20043 Arcore (MI) / IT | 02 /
QUINN, Paul Pfizer Global Res. and Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 03 /
SERDAREVIC, Dzelal Pfizer Global Res. and Develop ment, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 04 /
SKILLERN, Laurence Howard Pfizer Global Res. and Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
COLLI, Enrico Pfizer Global Res. and Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
02 /
QUINN, Paul Pfizer Global Res. and Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | |||
03 /
SERDAREVIC, Dzelal Pfizer Global Res. and Develop ment, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | |||
04 /
SKILLERN, Laurence Howard Pfizer Global Res. and Development, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/39] | Grubb, Philip William Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02702623.6 | 05.03.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002IB00664 | Priority number, date | GB20010029962 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129962 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051354 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458376 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458376 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4025, A61P13/10 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/4025 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/402 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 14.07.2004 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DARIFENACIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES HARNDRANGS | [2006/13] | English: | DARIFENACIN FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF URGENCY INDUCED BY OVERACTIVE BLADDER | [2004/39] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA DARIFENACINE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MICTIONS IMPERIEUSES INDUITES PAR UNE VESSIE HYPERACTIVE | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/39] | DARIFENACIN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEANHDLUNG DER HARNDRANG | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | BE | 04.10.2006 | |
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9709980 (PFIZER RES & DEV [IE], et al) [DY] 6,7 * example -; claims 1,13,18 *; | [XY] - CHAPPLE C R, "Muscarinic receptor antagonists in the treatment of overactive bladder.", UROLOGY, (2000 MAY) 55 (5A SUPPL) 33-46;DISCUSSION 50. REF: 119, XP002199634 [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * page 33, column 1 * * page 41, column 2 - page 42, column 2 * [Y] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(99)00492-6 | [X] - DMOCHOWSKI ROGER R ET AL, "Advancements in pharmacologic management of the overactive bladder.", UROLOGY, (200012), vol. 56, no. 6A Supplement, ISSN 0090-4295, pages 41 - 49, XP002199635 [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * page 41, column 1 * * page 46, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(00)01020-7 | [A] - ALABASTER V A, "Discovery and development of selective M-3 antagonists for clinical use.", LIFE SCIENCES, Seventh International Symposium on Subtypes of Muscarinic Receptors;Vienna, Virginia, USA; November 12-15, 1996, (1997), vol. 60, no. 13-14, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1053 - 1060, XP002199636 [A] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0024-3205(97)00047-7 |