EP1484712 - IC CARD AND CARD READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Universal Entertainment Corporation Ariake Frontier Building, Tower A, 3-7-26 Ariake, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Aruze Corporation 1-25, Ariake 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0063 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA, Kazuei 6197,Hongoumae,Mamejima Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-0022 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702883.6 | 11.03.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002JP02263 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077195 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484712 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484712 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G06K17/00, B42D15/10, H01Q1/38 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07786 (EP,US);
G06K19/07788 (EP,US);
G06K7/10326 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/40 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] | Title | German: | CHIPKARTE UND KARTENLESER | [2004/50] | English: | IC CARD AND CARD READER | [2004/50] | French: | CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2004 | Translation filed | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.08.2011 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 10.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8706746 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,8* page 5, column 1 - page 8, column 30; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH06150079 (PFU LTD); | [A]JPH06187514 (PFU LTD) | by applicant | WO8706754 |