EP1376197 - BEAM ARRANGEMENT CONVERTER, SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DEVICE AND SOLID LASER DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DEVICE AND SOLID LASER DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
[2011/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Bunri University 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi Oita 870-0397 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Bunri University 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi Oita 870-0397 / JP | |||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Bunri University 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi Oita 870-0397 / JP | |||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Ohtemachi-2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Bunri University 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi, Oita 870-0397 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Satoshi, Nippon Bunri University school of Engineering 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi, Oita 870-0397 / JP | 02 /
HAMADA, Naoya, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Development Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | [2012/09] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Satoshi, Nippon Bunri University school of Engineering, 1727-162, Oaza-Ichigi Oita-shi, Oita 870-0397 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMADA, Naoya, NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702918.0 | 12.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002JP02314 | Priority number, date | JP20010101454 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001101454 | [2004/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02082163 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376197 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376197 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G02B19/0057 (EP,US);
G02B27/00 (KR);
G02B19/0014 (EP,US);
G02B27/09 (EP,US);
G02B27/0961 (EP,US);
G02B27/0966 (EP,US);
G02B27/0972 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/09] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STRAHLANORDNUNGSWANDLER, HALBLEITERLASEREINRICHTUNG UND FESTLASEREINRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2011/31] | English: | BEAM ARRANGEMENT CONVERTER, SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DEVICE AND SOLID LASER DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2011/31] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE L'AGENCEMENT DE FAISCEAUX, DISPOSITIF LASER A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF LASER SOLIDE UTILISANT LE PREMIER | [2011/31] |
Former [2004/01] | HALBLEITERLASEREINRICHTUNG UND FESTLASEREINRICHTUNG DAMIT | ||
Former [2004/01] | SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DEVICE AND SOLID LASER DEVICE USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2004/01] | DISPOSITIF LASER A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF LASER SOLIDE UTILISANT LE PREMIER | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2003 | Translation filed | 24.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5369661 (YAMAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 5,6* abstract *; | [AD]US5513201 (YAMAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [AD] 5-30 * abstract *; | [XA]US6115185 (DU KEMING [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, lines 60-65; figures 5a,5b * * column 12, lines 11-46 * [A] 5-30 | International search | [Y]US5513201 (YAMAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5790576 (WAARTS ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US5969872 (BEN OREN ILAN [IL], et al) |