EP1363084 - REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZA, Noriho 2-7-11, Nojihigashi Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-0058 / JP | 02 /
FUNAKURA, Masami 12-10-303, Kidamotomiya 2-chome Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0822 / JP | 03 /
NISHIWAKI, Fumitoshi 12-18-609, Takakuracho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0872 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Yuji 5-73-3, Inano-cho Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0861 / JP | 05 /
YAKUMARU, Yuuichi Syoto-syataku 306, 5-22-13, Tohda-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0014 / JP | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703853.8 | 20.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002JP01441 | Priority number, date | JP20010044725 | 21.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001044725 | JP20020008390 | 17.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002008390 | JP20020008400 | 17.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002008400 | [2003/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066907 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363084 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B43/00 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
F25B40/00 (EP,US);
F25B43/00 (KR);
F25B43/02 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US);
F28F1/022 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | KÜHLKREISLAUFVORRICHTUNG | [2003/47] | English: | REFRIGERATION CYCLE DEVICE | [2003/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF A CYCLE DE REFRIGERATION | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2003 | Translation filed | 12.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 26.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2804844B ; | [Y]JP2000274890 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [Y]JP2000046420 (ZEXEL CORP); | [Y]JPH0255063U ; | [Y]JPH11351680 (CALSONIC CORP); | [Y]JPH11173688 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2000161213 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION); | [Y]JP2000515958 ; | [Y]JP2000110725 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION); | [A]JP2000046421 (CALSONIC CORP) | [Y] - PETTERSEN J. ET AL., "Development of compact heat exchangers for CO2 air-conditioning systems", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, (1998), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 180 - 193, XP004287241 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-7007(98)00013-9 |