EP1378502 - CHAIN OLIGOLACTIC ACID ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Education Instruments Co., Ltd. 164, Shimokasuya Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1143 / JP | [2006/09] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states AMATO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, LTD. 995, Saso-cho Fukuchiyama-shi, Kyoto 620-0932 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Mikio 5-8-2-208, Tsurumakiminami Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 257-0002 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Masahiro 17-6, Kirennishi 3-chome Hirano-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0026 / JP | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer, Thomas, et al polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Godemeyer, Thomas, Dr., et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703972.6 | 12.03.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002JP02294 | Priority number, date | JP20010006976 | 13.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001006976 | [2004/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072531 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378502 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/67, C07C67/313, C07F7/18, A61K31/22, A61K31/00, A23L1/00 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
C07C69/68 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/03 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/02] | C07C69/67, C07C67/313, C07F7/18, A61K31/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KETTENFÖRMIGER OLIGOMILCHSÄUREESTER | [2004/02] | English: | CHAIN OLIGOLACTIC ACID ESTER | [2004/02] | French: | ESTER D'ACIDE OLIGOLACTIQUE A CHAINE | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2003 | Translation filed | 13.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 02.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1020324 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM) [X] 1-3 * examples 1,4,5 *[A] 4-7 | International search | [Y]JPH06228287 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JPH09227388 (NAGANUSHI TETSUAKI, et al); | [Y]JPH10158370 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH10231358 (SHOKUHIN SANGYO KANKYO HOZEN G); | [Y]JP2000239171 (TOKAI KYOIKU SANGYO KK, et al); | [X] - PASKE ERIN E. ET AL., "Determining stereochemical relationships in polylactide; synthesis and characterization of polylactide hexads", POLYMER PREPRINTS (AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DIVISION OF POLYMER CHEMISTRY), (2000), vol. 41, no. 2, page 1378, XP002953848 | [X] - LIEBICH H.M. ET AL., "Identification of side-products formed by derivation of 2-hydroxy carboxylic acids with methyl and ethyl chloroformate", J. CHROMATOGR., (1992), vol. 626, no. 2, pages 289 - 293, XP002953849 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(92)85423-Q | [X] - MATSUO SHUNJI ET AL., "Analysis of optical rotatory dispersion of poly- and oligo(L-lactate) by two-term drude equation", MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1972), vol. 152, pages 203 - 215, XP002953850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1972.021520120 |