EP1355801 - ARMREST SUBASSEMBLY FOR THE DOOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG, Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | [2005/21] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRNCHEN, Thomas Pödeldorfer Strasse 81 96052 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
EISENTRAUDT, Michael Rosenau 2 96342 Stockheim / DE | 03 /
LISTL, Eckart Vierether Strasse 3 96191 Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | 04 /
SCHLECHTRIEMEN, Martin Kapellenstrasse 25 96149 Breitengüssbach / DE | 05 /
STAMMBERGER, Werner Untersiemauer Strasse 19 96253 Weissenbrunn / DE | 06 /
POHL, Thomas Elsterweg 14 91091 Grossenseebach / DE | 07 /
WAGNER, Frank Juwelenstrasse 5 90408 Nürnberg / DE | 08 /
WARTZACK, Sandro Erlweinstrasse 17 96103 Hallstadt / DE | [2004/04] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
BÖRNCHEN, Thomas Pödeldorfer Strasse 81 96052 Bamberg / DE | ||
02 /
EISENTRAUDT, Michael Rosenau 2 96342 Stockheim / DE | |||
03 /
LISTL, Eckart Vierether Strasse 3 96191 Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | |||
04 /
SCHLECHTRIEMEN, Martin Pfarrer-Wächter-Strasse 7 96103 Hallstadt / DE | |||
05 /
STAMMBERGER, Werner Untersiemauer Strasse 19 96253 Weissenbrunn / DE | |||
06 /
POHL, Thomas Elsterweg 14 91091 Grossenseebach / DE | |||
07 /
WAGNER, Frank Juwelenstrasse 5 90408 Nürnberg / DE | |||
08 /
WARTZACK, Sandro Erlweinstrasse 17 96103 Hallstadt / DE | |||
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
BÖRNCHEN, Thomas Pödeldorfer Strasse 81 96052 Bamberg / DE | ||
02 /
EISENTRAUDT, Michael Rosenau 2 96342 Stockheim / DE | |||
03 /
LISTL, Eckart Vierether Strasse 3 96191 Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | |||
04 /
SCHLECHTRIEMEN, Martin Pfarrer-Wächter-Strasse 7 96103 Hallstadt / DE | |||
05 /
STAMMBERGER, Werner Untersiemauer Strasse 19 96253 Weissenbrunn / DE | |||
06 /
POHL, Thomas Waldstrasse 14 91091 Grossenseebach / DE | |||
07 /
WAGNER, Frank Juwelenstrasse 5 90408 Nürnberg / DE | |||
08 /
WARTZACK, Sandro Erlweinstrasse 17 96103 Hallstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/44] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02704594.7 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002DE00120 | Priority number, date | DE2001104077 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10104077 | DE2001144485 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144485 | DE2001144492 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144492 | [2003/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02060721 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355801 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355801 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/46 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B60N2/77 (EP,US);
B60N2/763 (EP,US);
B60N2/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/51] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ARMLEHNENBAUGRUPPE FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR | [2003/44] | English: | ARMREST SUBASSEMBLY FOR THE DOOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2003/44] | French: | SOUS-ENSEMBLE D'ACCOUDOIR DESTINE A UNE PORTIERE AUTOMOBILE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 25.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3930270 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [A] 1* column A; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4135279 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0669221 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5795025 (MURPHY PATRICK [US]) [Y] 6,9,11,14,17,18 * column 5, line 17 - line 63; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5921610 (GRIMES JOHN A [US]) [X] 1,3,7,10,16 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 8; figure 9 * [Y] 6,9,11,14,17,18; | [A]EP1048517 (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,4,7 * | by applicant | DE4002242 |