EP1382587 - PIEZOELECTRIC PORCELAIN AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF, AND PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2009/28] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Satoshi c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705068.1 | 04.03.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002JP01937 | Priority number, date | JP20010100910 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001100910 | JP20010121371 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001121371 | [2004/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081404 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382587 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382587 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/49, H01L41/187 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
C04B35/493 (EP,US);
C04B35/491 (KR);
H10N30/853 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3279 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3281 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3284 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3294 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/79 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/04] | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHES PORZELLAN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE PIEZOELEKTRISCHES ELEMENT | [2004/04] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC PORCELAIN AND METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF, AND PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT | [2004/04] | French: | CERAMIQUE PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION, ET ELEMENT PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2003 | Translation filed | 30.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/07] | FR | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS4526146B ; | [A]JPS5082596 ; | [Y]JPS543298 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPS58190871 (TAIYO YUDEN KK); | [Y]JPS60103079 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS); | [Y]JPS6465070 (TOTO LTD); | [X]JPH029761 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH02145476 (INAX CORP); | [Y]JPH07315924 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPH1192217 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11109357 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]US6207069 (FURUKAWA MASAHITO [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2001097774 (KYOCERA CORP); | [AP]JP2001181033 (TDK CORP) |