EP1371725 - NOVEL AMINOPEPTIDASE AND ITS GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2006/09] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIBUCHI, Kyoko Food Res. & Dpt Lab Ajinmoto Co.Inc 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210 / JP | 02 /
NINOMIYA, Daiki. Food Res. & Dpt Lab Ajinmoto Co. Inc 1-1, Suzuki-Cho, Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kawagawa 210 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Mari, Food Res. & Dpt Lab. Ajinmoto Co. Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210-08 / JP | 04 /
UEDA, Yoichi. Seasoning Res. & Dpt Lab. Ajinmoto Co. Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210-08 / JP | 05 /
MARUYAMA, Jun-ichi 3-12-12, Nishiayase Adachi-Ku, Tokyo 120-0014 / JP | 06 /
KITAMOTO, Katsuhiko 2-15-12, Yayoi Bunkyo-Ku, Tokyo 113-0032 / JP | [2005/44] |
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
KOIBUCHI, K. Food Res. & Dpt Lab, Ajinmoto Co. Inc 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210 / JP | ||
02 /
NINOMIYA, D. Food Res. & Dpt Lab, Ajinmoto Co. Inc 1-1, Suzuki-Cho, Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kawagawa 210 / JP | |||
03 /
KOJIMA, M. Food Res. & Dpt Lab., Ajimoto Co. Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210-08 / JP | |||
04 /
UEDA, Y. Seasoning Res. & Dpt Lab., Ajimoto Co Inc 1-1, Suzuki-Cho Kawasaki-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 210-08 / JP | |||
05 /
MARUYAMA, Jun-ichi 3-12-12, Nishiayase Adachi-Ku, Tokyo 120-0014 / JP | |||
06 /
KITAMOTO, Katsuhiko 2-15-12, Yayoi Bunkyo-Ku, Tokyo 113-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2003/51] | Application number, filing date | 02705238.0 | 15.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002JP02476 | Priority number, date | JP20010078930 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001078930 | JP20010293348 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001293348 | [2003/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077223 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371725 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371725 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N9/48, C12N15/57 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
C12N9/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE AMINOPEPTIDASE UND IHR GEN | [2003/51] | English: | NOVEL AMINOPEPTIDASE AND ITS GENE | [2003/51] | French: | NOUVELLE AMINOPEPTIDASE ET SON GENE | [2003/51] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2003 | Translation filed | 09.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 31.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2006 | BE | 01.03.2006 | CH | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | FR | 01.03.2006 | IT | 01.03.2006 | LI | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | TR | 01.03.2006 | IE | 15.03.2006 | LU | 15.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | GB | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | ES | 12.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
FR | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
LU | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
LU | 15.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
LU | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
GB | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
BE | 01.03.2006 | ||
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0359164 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * SEQ ID NOs: 15 (accession no: AAQ03601, I08206) SEQ ID NO: 16 (accession no: AAA55218) * * figure 3 * * example 12 * [A] 3,9; | [DXA]EP1036843 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [DX] 1,2,5-8 * page 4, paragraphs 26-33 *[A] 3,9; | [DXA] - LEE G -D ET AL, Purification and properties of an extracellular leucine aminopeptidase from the Bacillus sp. N2, JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, VOL. 85, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 561-566, (199809), ISSN 1364-5072, XP002288598 [DX] 1,2,5-8 * page 561, column L, lines 7-13 * * page 563, column R, paragraph 3 * [A] 3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2672.1998.853536.x | International search | [A]SU975797 (PUTERE MARIYA P, et al); | [A]EP0794253 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [A] - VANKUYK P.A. ET AL., "Analysis of two aspergillus nidulans genes encoding extracellular proteases", FUNGAL GENETICS AND BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 29, pages 201 - 210, XP002952737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/fgbi.2000.1195 | [A] - BLINKOVSKY A.M., "A non-specific aminopeptidase from aspergillus", (2000), vol. 1480, pages 171 - 181, XP004278956 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4838(00)00064-9 |