EP1271893 - DATA COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHINO, Masanori, SONY COMPUTER ENT. INC. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
HONDA, Toshio, SONY COMPUTER ENT. INC. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAI, Takuya, SONY COMPUTER ENT. INC. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [2003/01] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705292.7 | 18.03.2002 | [2003/01] | WO2002JP02544 | Priority number, date | JP20010094387 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001094387 | JP20020050343 | 26.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002050343 | [2003/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02080495 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271893 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04L69/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2003/01] | Title | German: | DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2003/01] | English: | DATA COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2003/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2002 | Translation filed | 18.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 20.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/11] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5799175 (CASSIDAY DANIEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 10 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JPH11127146 (NEC CORP) [Y] 2-11; | [A]WO0007340 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 11, line 25 - page 20, line 24; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]US6130880 (NAUDUS STANLEY T [US], et al) [X] 1,12-17 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 42; figures 1-2B * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 43; figures 3,4 * * column 13, line 16 - column 14, line 55; figures 12A,12B * [Y] 2-11; | US6463077 [ ] (SATO TSUYOSHI [JP]) [ ] * column 7, line 34 - column 10, line 67; figures 1-4D * | International search | [A]JPH06268707 (NEC CORP, et al); | [A]JPH1198265 (CANON KK); | [X]JPH11127146 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH11284684 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH11298625 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO); | [Y]JPH11333141 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO); | [Y]JP2001036965 (DENSO CORP); | [XE]JP2001237984 (NINTENDO CO LTD) |