EP1296475 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, MOBILE STATION, BASE STATION, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UESUGI, Mitsuru 17-1-402, Anjindai Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-0048 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMATSU, Katsuhiko 2-56-14-1212, Kinugasasakaecho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-0031 / JP | 03 /
MIYA, Kazuyuki 1132-22, Kamiasao, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0021 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Osamu 5-45-G302, Syonantakatori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0066 / JP | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705351.1 | 19.03.2002 | [2003/13] | WO2002JP02612 | Priority number, date | JP20010079207 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001079207 | [2003/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075994 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296475 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J13/04, H04L12/56, H04Q7/30 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/54 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,US);
H04L47/50 (EP,US);
H04L47/6215 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | H04J13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, PROGRAMM, SPEICHERMEDIUM, MOBILSTATION, BASISSTATION UND SYSTEM ZUR NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2003/13] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION PROGRAM, RECORDING MEDIUM, MOBILE STATION, BASE STATION, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2003/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION, PROGRAMME DE COMMUNICATION, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, STATION MOBILE, STATION DE BASE, ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2002 | Translation filed | 10.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 02.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/12] | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9414263 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-3,11-13 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 25 ** page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 15; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JPH0316448 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH04157844 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH1132050 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2001016226 (NEC CORP); | [Y] - DASTANGOO S., VOJCIC B.R., "Performance of enhanced multi-code spread slotted Aloha(EMCSSA) with voice and data", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, ICC'99, (19990606), vol. 3, pages 1683 - 1689, XP002953508 | [Y] - SANDOUK A. ET AL., "A scheme for throughput improvement in voice/data CDMA packet communications", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999, (19990919), vol. 1 CONF.50, pages 362 - 366, XP002953509 | [Y] - YAMAZATO TAKAYA , KATAYAMA MASAAKI, OGAWA AKIRA, "CDMA niyoru multimedia packet tsushin", THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS GIJUTSU KENKYU HOKOKU SST98-42, (19981210), vol. 98, no. 452, pages 9 - 14, XP002953510 |