EP1383499 - METHOD OF IMMUNOMODULATION USING THIONE-FORMING DISULFIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The GRASSETTI Family Trust 19810 Peppermint Falls Road Jamestown, CA 95327 / US | [2006/07] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Grassetti, Davide R. 19810 Peppermint Falls Road Jamestown, CA 95327 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASSETTI, Davide, R. deceased / US | 02 /
MORO, Camillo Via G. Zanon, 26 I-35133 Padova / IT | [2006/07] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
GRASSETTI, Davide, R. 19810 Peppermint Falls Road Jamestown, CA 95327 / US | ||
02 /
MORO, Camillo Via G. Zanon, 26 I-35133 Padova / IT | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705749.6 | 10.01.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US00795 | Priority number, date | US20010260943P | 10.01.2001 Original published format: US 260943 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02055080 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1383499 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383499 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/426, A61K31/10, A61P37/02 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMMUNOMODULIERUNG MIT THIONEBILDENDEN DISULFIDEN | [2012/35] | English: | METHOD OF IMMUNOMODULATION USING THIONE-FORMING DISULFIDES | [2004/05] | French: | METHODE D'MMUNOMODULATION AU MOYEN DE DISULFURES A FORMATION DE THIONE | [2004/05] |
Former [2004/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR IMMUNOMODULIERUNG MIT THIONEBILDENDE DISULFIDE | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.03.2013 | BE | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
BE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0194571 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,17-22,24 * page 2 - page 8, line 17 * * page 12 - page 16, line 13 * * page 19 - page 20, line 15 * * page 22 - page 23; example 8 * * claims 1-3,5 * [A] 10,12; | [X]EP0236929 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document, especially pages 8-10 *; | [X]WO9604242 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1,17-22 * page 2 lines 5-9, 18-20; page 6 lines 15-35; page 7 lines 1-8 * * page 96 - page 101 * * claims 78,79 *; | [A]US5889050 (ANDERSSON CARL-MAGNUS ALEXANDE [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2 *; | [A]WO9942097 (DOVETAIL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6,10-16 * the whole document, especially page 5 *; | [A]US6001555 (HENDERSON LOUIS E [US], et al) [A] 1-4,17-24 * column 3, line 11 - line 18 * * column 4, line 21 - line 25 * * column 8, line 8 - line 20 * * column 13, line 50 - line 67 *; | JP2002193796 [ ] (AJINOMOTO KK) [ ] * Table 2, 6th compound; Table 4 second compound; Table 5 7th compound; Table 6 first, 6th and 7th compounds; Table 7 first and 5th compounds. *; | [X] - WHITEHOUSE M W ET AL, "CELL SURFACE POISONS (ZOG'S) AS POTENTIAL IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE AGENTS", PHARMACOLOGIST, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTIC, US, (1971), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0031-7004, page 236, XP008018260 [X] 1,2,17-23 * abstract 252 * | [XA] - MERRYMAN P F ET AL, "ALTERATION OF LYMPHOCYTE RESPONSE BY SULFHYDRYL AND DISULFIDE COMPOUNDS", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (19790701), vol. 28, no. 15, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 2297 - 2302, XP008018277 [X] 1-3,17-22 * page 2297, column L, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 * * page 2300 - page 2302 * [A] 10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(79)90693-2 | [XA] - SYLWESTER A W ET AL, "CD4+ T-LYMPHOCYTE DEPLETION IN HUMAN LYMPHOID TISSUE EX VIVO IS NOT INDUCED BY NONINFECTIOUS HUMAN IMMUNODEFICENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 VIRIONS", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199811), vol. 72, no. 11, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 9345 - 9347, XP001148244 [X] 1,2,17-22 * the whole document * [A] 3,4 | [X] - HADDEN J W, "THYMOMIMETIC DRUGS", SERONO SYMPOSIA SERIES, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1985), ISSN 1057-624X, pages 183 - 192, XP008018269 [X] 1,2,7 * page 187, paragraph 2 * * page 189; table 1 * | [XA] - IKARASHI Y ET AL, "EVALUATION OF CONTACT SENSITIVITY OF RUBBER CHEMICALS USING THE MURINE LOCAL LYMPH NODE ASSAY", CONTACT DERMATITIS, MUNKSGAARD, DK, (1993), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0105-1873, pages 77 - 80, XP008018268 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3 | [X] - KORCHAK H M ET AL, "ACTIVATION OF THE NEUTROPHIL: THE ROLE OF ANION FLUXES IN NEUTROPHIL SECRETION", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1980), ISSN 0077-8923, pages 346 - 347, XP008018274 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1980.tb15414.x | [X] - TOOHEY J I, "PERSULFIDE SULFUR IS A GROWTH FACTOR FOR CELLS DEFECTIVE IN SULFUR METABOLISM", BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY. BIOCHIMIE ET BIOLOGIE CELLULAIRE, XX, XX, (198608), vol. 64, no. 8, ISSN 0829-8211, pages 758 - 765, XP008018273 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - DOMAGALA J M ET AL, "2,2'-DITHIOBISBENZAMIDES AND 2-BENZISOTHIAZOLONES, TWO NEW CLASSES OF ANTIRETROVIRAL AGENTS: SAR AND MECHANISTIC CONSIDERATIONS", DRUG DESIGN AND DISCOVERY, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, XX, (1997), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 1055-9612, pages 49 - 61, XP001036902 [A] 1,4,17-21 * the whole document * | [E] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 64, Database accession no. 2002-594385, XP002251717 [E] 1,17-24 * abstract * |