EP1370996 - COMPUTERIZED COMMISSION BASED TRADING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.C. Jacoby & Company, Inc. 1716 Hidden Creek Court St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | [2003/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBY, Theodore, C., Jr. 1716 Hidden Creek Court St. Louis, MO 63131 / US | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer, John James Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, Rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Dennemeyer, John James Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2003/51] | Lampe, Sigmar Dennemeyer & Associates s.a., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02706050.8 | 29.01.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002US02552 | Priority number, date | US20010773803 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: US 773803 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02063422 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1370996 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0613 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | COMPUTERGESTÜTZTE HANDELSOPERATIONEN AUF KOMMISSIONSBASIS | [2003/51] | English: | COMPUTERIZED COMMISSION BASED TRADING OPERATIONS | [2003/51] | French: | OPERATIONS COMMERCIALES A LA COMMISSION INFORMATISEES | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 10.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US5666493 (WOJCIK CASIMIR M [US], et al); | [XP]US2001032165 (FRIEND RALPH K [US], et al); | [XE]US2002049645 (TAKAHASHI NOBUO [JP]); | [XE]US2002069156 (ADAM KERRY [US], et al) |