EP1374120 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GUARANTEED LOANS AND NOTIFYING GUARANTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital One Financial Corporation 2980 Fairview Park Drive Falls Church, VA 22042 / US | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNALL, Peter, A. 6703 Moly Drive Falls Church, VA 22046 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02706272.8 | 15.02.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US04406 | Priority number, date | US20010783980 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: US 783980 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02067085 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374120 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG GARANTIERTER DARLEHEN UND ZUM BENACHRICHTIGEN VON GARANTEN | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GUARANTEED LOANS AND NOTIFYING GUARANTORS | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DES PRETS GARANTIS ET DE NOTIFIER DES GARANTS | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 10.04.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US2001037274 (MONTICCIOLO DOUGLAS [US]); | [AP]JP2002041780 (IND BANK OF JAPAN LTD, et al); | [AP]US2002019793 (FRATTALONE NICHOLAS [US]); | [XE]US2002103667 (JANNAH SHEKAR [US], et al); | [AE]US2002103750 (HERZFELD THOMAS [US]) |