EP1392152 - SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING TISSUE CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/10] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING TISSUE CHARACTERISTICS | ||
[2012/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECTRX Inc. 6025A Unity Drive Norcross, GA 30071 / US | For all designated states Bambot, Shabbir 650 Manor Glen Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | For all designated states Faupel, Mark L. 160 Folgarth way Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | For all designated states Agrawal, Anant 3078 Clairmont Road 526 Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | For all designated states Ignotz, Keith D. 3151 Willow Green Court Duluth, GA 30136 / US | For all designated states Fordham, Andrew 1194 Lennox Court Sugar Hill, GA / US | [2013/19] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states SPECTRX Inc. 6025A Unity Drive Norcross, GA 30071 / US | ||
For all designated states Bambot, Shabbir 650 Manor Glen Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | |||
For all designated states Faupel, Mark L. 160 Folgarth way Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | |||
For all designated states Agrawal, Anant 3078 Clairmont Road 526 Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | |||
For all designated states Ignotz, Keith D. 3151 Willow Green Court Duluth, GA 30136 / US | |||
For all designated states Fordham, Andrew 1194 Lennox Court Sugar Hill, GA / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMBOT, Shabbir 650 Manor Glen Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | 02 /
FAUPEL, Mark, L. 160 Folgarth Way Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 03 /
AGRAWAL, Anant 3078 Clairmont Road 526 Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | 04 /
IGNOTZ, Keith, D. 3151 Willow Green Court Duluth, GA 30136 / US | 05 /
FORDHAM, Andrew 1194 Lennox Court Sugar Hill, GA / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02706488.0 | 01.03.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US06350 | Priority number, date | US20010272458P | 02.03.2001 Original published format: US 272458 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02071026 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392152 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392152 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B1/06 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/4331 (EP);
A61B5/0071 (EP);
A61B5/0075 (EP);
A61B5/0084 (EP);
A61B5/444 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/10] | A61B1/06, A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON GEWEBEEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2012/49] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING TISSUE CHARACTERISTICS | [2012/49] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER DES CARACTERISTIQUES TISSULAIRES | [2012/49] |
Former [2004/10] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON GEWEBEEIGENSCHAFTEN | ||
Former [2004/10] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING TISSUE CHARACTERISTICS | ||
Former [2004/10] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER DES CARACTERISTIQUES TISSULAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | ES | 19.08.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
ES | 19.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5674182 (SUZUKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 5* figure 1 *; | [X]US5749830 (KANEKO MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 7, line 21 - column 9, line 17 *; | [X]WO9957529 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 11, line 31 - page 14, line 24 * * figures 1,6 *; | [X]US6002137 (HAYASHI KATSUMI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 10, line 23 - line 67 *; | [X]WO0043750 (NEWTON LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 5B,7 *; | [X]WO0042910 (NEWTON LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]US6061591 (FREITAG LUTZ [DE], et al); | [A]US6110106 (MACKINNON NICHOLAS B [CA], et al); | [X]US6118521 (JUNG WAYNE D [US], et al); | [XE]US6364829 (FULGHUM STEPHEN F [US]); | [AE]US6487440 (DECKERT CURTIS K [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9957529 |