EP1360022 - FLANGE SLEEVE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND BENDING TOOL FOR PRODUCING FLANGES ON A SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH & Co.KG Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHHOF, Klaus Niederseelbacher Strasse 45 a 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 02 /
VALASIADIS, Konstantinos Reiherstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02706657.0 | 31.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002DE00338 | Priority number, date | DE2001107109 | 14.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10107109 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02064283 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1360022 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1360022 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/10, F16C33/14 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
F16C17/10 (EP,US);
B21D11/08 (EP,US);
B21D19/08 (EP,US);
B21D53/10 (EP,US);
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
F16C2220/42 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49673 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUNDBUCHSE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND BIEGEWERKZEUG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BUNDEN AN EINER BUCHSE | [2003/46] | English: | FLANGE SLEEVE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND BENDING TOOL FOR PRODUCING FLANGES ON A SLEEVE | [2003/46] | French: | DOUILLE A COLLET, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET OUTIL DE CINTRAGE POUR REALISER DES COLLETS SUR UNE DOUILLE | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
GR | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2049184 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) [X] 1-3,13,14,17,20 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * [Y] 4-6,9-11; | [Y]DE2406361 (GLYCO METALL WERKE) [Y] 9-11 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US4048703 (LEHNHART DIETER) [Y] 4-6 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE19524757 (SKF GLEITLAGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9,13,20* figures 1-5 * |