EP1387721 - SILICONE ANTIFOAMING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Asia Ltd. 1-3 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states DOW CORNING ASIA Ltd 1-3 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Jianren 7-2, Matsudasoryo Matsuda-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | [2005/19] |
Former [2004/07] | 01 /
ZENG, Jianren 7-2, Matsudasoryo Matsuda-machi, Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagaw / JP | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02707124.0 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002JP02722 | Priority number, date | JP20010081016 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001081016 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02074407 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1387721 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387721 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/04 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B01D19/0409 (EP,US);
B01D19/04 (KR);
B01D19/0413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIKON-ANTISCHAUMMITTEL | [2004/07] | English: | SILICONE ANTIFOAMING AGENT | [2004/07] | French: | AGENT ANTI-MOUSSE SILICONE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2005 | BE | 18.05.2005 | CH | 18.05.2005 | CY | 18.05.2005 | FI | 18.05.2005 | LI | 18.05.2005 | NL | 18.05.2005 | TR | 18.05.2005 | DK | 18.08.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | SE | 18.08.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 18.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05317607 ; | [A]US3784479 (KEIL J) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US5271868 (AZECHI SYUICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0663225 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1,2* claims 1,9 *; | [A]US5486549 (ITAGAKI AKINARI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1076073 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 02, Database accession no. 1994-011174, XP002215688 & JPH05317607 A 19931203 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |