EP1364131 - SELF-TAPPING INSERT, INSERT ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING THE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL DYNAMICS LAND SYSTEMS, INC. 38500 Mound Road Sterling Heights, MI 48310-3268 / US | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHEELER, Fredric, J. 1823 West Elm Street Lima, OH 45805 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 02707465.7 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002US00970 | Priority number, date | US20010775709 | 01.02.2001 Original published format: US 775709 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02061290 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1364131 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364131 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16B1/00, F16B37/12 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F16B37/127 (EP,US);
F16B25/00 (KR);
Y10T29/49963 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | F16B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | "SELBSTSCHNEIDENDER EINSATZ, EINSATZANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DES EINSATZES" | [2003/48] | English: | SELF-TAPPING INSERT, INSERT ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING THE INSERT | [2003/48] | French: | DOUILLE AUTO-TARAUDEUSE, ENSEMBLE DOUILLE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT LE MONTAGE DE CETTE DOUILLE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 11.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 07.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB883564 (ROSAN ENG CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-8; | [A]GB1205265 (ROSAN SR JOSE [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 114 - page 3, line 50 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]GB1482624 (BARNSDALE A) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP0272020 (COLE HARRY FRANCIS) [A] 1-8 * figures 3-5 * | International search | [A]US2886090 (JOSEPH ROSAN); | [X]US4223585 (BARTH GERALD D, et al); | [A]US4334815 (KNOHL RUDOLPH E); | [A]US4673323 (RUSSO PETER [US]) |