EP1410487 - POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF POWER CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartronics Inc. Stuart Barron, PO Box 126, Highway 14 West Marion, AL 36756 / US | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRON, Stuart P.O. Box 126, Highway 14 West Marion, AL 36756 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/42] |
Former [2004/17] | Grabherr, Claudia, Dipl.Ing. Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02707599.3 | 30.01.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US02495 | Priority number, date | US20010774108 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 774108 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061934 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410487 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H02M1/4208 (EP,US);
H02M7/2173 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 09.12.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEWANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEWANDLUNG | [2004/17] | English: | POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF POWER CONVERSION | [2004/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONVERSION DE COURANT ET PROCEDE DE CONVERSION DE COURANT | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2006/10] | 18.09.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.12.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 09.12.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.12.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4062057 (PERKINS DONALD W, et al); | [Y]US5432695 (VLATKOVIC VLATKO [US], et al); | [Y]US5633793 (LEE FRED C [US], et al); | [Y]US5546295 (PRETE RALPH [US], et al); | [Y]US5684683 (DIVAN DEEPAKRAJ M [US], et al); | [Y]USRE29560E (FRANK KJELL, et al); | [Y]US5771163 (MORIGUCHI HARUO [JP], et al) |