EP1377335 - APPARATUS FOR GUIDED TRANSLUMINAL INTERVENTIONS USING VESSEL WALL PENETRATING CATHETERS AND OTHER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/02] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR GUIDED TRANSLUMINAL INTERVENTIONS USING VESSEL WALL PENETRATING CATHETERS AND OTHER APPARATUS | ||
[2007/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Medtronic AVE, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa California 95403 / US | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Transvacular, Inc. 1505-D Adams Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACAULAY, Patrick, E. 1426 Sprucewood Drive San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 02 /
LAMSON, Theodore, C. 2172 Camino Brazos Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | 03 /
MAKOWER, Joshua 450 Tyndall Street Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
KIM, Isaac, Han, Joon 3849 Jasmine Circle San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 05 /
BECKEY, Brian, R. 421 Greenwood Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/02] | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Sommerville & Rushton Business Link Building 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02707755.1 | 06.02.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002US03941 | Priority number, date | US20010266800 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: US 266800 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02062265 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1377335 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377335 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B5/064 (EP,US);
A61B5/6853 (EP,US);
A61B5/6859 (EP,US);
A61B5/6886 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/5238 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US);
A61B17/3478 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00252 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61B5/061 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61B6/508 (EP,US);
A61B6/5247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR TRANSLUMINALE EINGRIFFE MIT GEFÜHRTEN KATHETERN ODER ANDEREN GERÄTEN, DIE DIE GEFÄSSWANDE DURCHDRINGEN | [2007/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR GUIDED TRANSLUMINAL INTERVENTIONS USING VESSEL WALL PENETRATING CATHETERS AND OTHER APPARATUS | [2007/14] | French: | APPAREILS POUR INTERVENTIONS TRANSLUMINALES GUIDEES UTILISANT DES CATHETERS OU AUTRES APPAREILS POUR PENETRER LA PAROI DU VAISSEAU | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/02] | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR TRANSLUMINALE EINGRIFFE MIT GEFÜHRTEN KATHETERN ODER ANDEREN GERÄTEN, DIE DIE GEFÄSSWANDE DURCHDRINGEN | ||
Former [2004/02] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR GUIDED TRANSLUMINAL INTERVENTIONS USING VESSEL WALL PENETRATING CATHETERS AND OTHER APPARATUS | ||
Former [2004/02] | METHODES ET APPAREILS POUR INTERVENTIONS TRANSLUMINALES GUIDEES UTILISANT DES CATHETERS OU AUTRES APPAREILS POUR PENETRER LA PAROI DU VAISSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | TR | 10.10.2007 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | LU | 06.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
LU | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5542915 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-7; | [XA]US6004269 (CROWLEY ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-7; | [PXA]US6233474 (LEMELSON JEROME [US]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * [PA] 3-7; | [PXA]US6332089 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) [PX] 1,2 * abstract *[PA] 3-7 | International search | [Y]US6004269 (CROWLEY ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US6332089 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) |