EP1377591 - TUMOUR INHIBITING GALLIUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faustus Forschungs Cie. Translational Cancer Research GmbH Grimmaische Strasse 2-4 04109 Leipzig / DE | [2006/26] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Faustus Forschungs Cie. Translational Cancer Research GmbH Grimmaische Strasse 2-4 04109 Leipzig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEPPLER, Bernhard Luisenstrasse 35 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02708371.6 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002EP03560 | Priority number, date | DE2001116527 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10116527 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081484 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1377591 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377591 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
C07D213/53 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TUMORHEMMENDE GALLIUMVERBINDUNGEN | [2004/02] | English: | TUMOUR INHIBITING GALLIUM COMPOUNDS | [2004/02] | French: | COMPOSES DE GALLIUM ANTITUMORAUX | [2004/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | GB | 28.03.2007 | [2013/08] |
Former [2013/07] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/13] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4596710 (COLLERY PHILIPPE [FR]) [YD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]US4657903 (SCOVILL JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2 *; | [YD]US5484778 (KENNEY MALCOLM E [US], et al) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y] - KLAYMAN, D. L. ET AL, "2-Acetylpyridine thiosemicarbazones. 6. 2-Acetylpyridine and 2-butyrylpyridine thiosemicarbazones as antileukemic agents", ARZNEIM.-FORSCH. (1983), 33(7), 909-12, XP001071299 [Y] 1-5 * Zusammenfassung; S. 910, Verbindungen IV 2, VI 7, 17 * | [Y] - HALL, IRIS H. ET AL, "The cytotoxicity of heterocyclic thiosemicarbazones and their metal complexes on human and murine tissue culture cells", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS (1993), 4(2), 231-40, XP002079621 [Y] 1-5 * S. 232, Verbindung #4 * | [Y] - KOVALA-DEMERTZI, DIMITRA ET AL, "Palladium(II) complexes of 2-acetylpyridine N(4)-propyl-, N(4)-dipropyl- and 3-hexamethyleneiminylthiosemicarbazones with potentially interesting biological activity. Synthesis, spectral properties, antifungal and in vitro antitumor activity", POLYHEDRON (1997), 16(20), 3625-3633, XP002201201 [Y] 1-5 * S. 3626, Verbindung 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0277-5387(97)00107-1 |