EP1371664 - WTI MODIFIED PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Institute of Cancer Immunology, Inc. 13-9, Enoki-cho Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2006/40] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Sugiyama, Haruo 2-19-30, Senbanishi Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama, Haruo 2-19-30, Senbanishi Minoo-shi Osaka 562-0036 / JP | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Sugiyama, Haruo Mino-shi Osaka 562-0036 / JP | ||
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wachenfeld, Joachim Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Wachenfeld, Joachim Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02708646.1 | 22.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002JP02794 | Priority number, date | JP20010083250 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001083250 | [2003/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02079253 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371664 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371664 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/82, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07K7/04, C12N5/06, C07K7/06 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,BR,US);
C07K14/82 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61K2039/5154 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | C07K14/82, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07K7/04, C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WTI-MODIFIZIERTES PEPTID | [2003/51] | English: | WTI MODIFIED PEPTIDE | [2003/51] | French: | PEPTIDE MODIFIE WT1 | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2003 | Translation filed | 15.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 09.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | LU | 22.03.2008 | IE | 24.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
LU | 22.03.2008 | ||
IE | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
LU | 22.03.2008 | ||
IE | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO03028758 (SUGIYAMA HARUO [JP], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [T] - AKIHIRO TSUBOI ET AL, "ENHANCED INDUCTION OF HUMAN WT1-SPECIFIC CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES WITH A 9-MER WT1 PEPTIDE MODIFIED AT HLA-A*2402-BINDING RESIDUES", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY, BERLIN, DE, (200212), vol. 51, no. 11-12, ISSN 0340-7004, pages 614 - 620, XP002961732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-002-0328-9 | International search | [A]WO9638176 (KISHIMOTO TADAMITSU [JP], et al); | [A]WO0006602 (SUGIYAMA HARUO [JP], et al); | [X]WO0018795 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO0026249 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al); | [A] - OKA Y. ET AL., "Cancer immunotherapy targeting wilms", J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 1773 - 1880, XP000890067 | [A] - TADOKORO KEIKO, "Gan yokusei idenshi WT1 no kino hatsugen", GENDAI KAGAKU EXTRA ISSUE 33 'GAN IDENSHI KENKYU NO TENBO II', (1997), pages 92 - 98, XP002955873 |