EP1388374 - METHOD OF FINISHING WITH HEAT INSULATION COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 33-1, Kanzakicho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0964 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 33-1, Kanzakicho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0964 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA, Yushichi, Kansai Paint Co, . Ltd. 17-1, Higashiyawata 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 02 /
ITOH, Hitoshi, Kansai Paint Co., Ltd. 17-1, Higashiyawata 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 03 /
SUGISHIMA, Masami, Kansai Paint Co., Ltd. 17-1, Higashiyawata 4-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/07] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02708724.6 | 29.03.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002JP03175 | Priority number, date | JP20010115483 | 13.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001115483 | [2004/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02083326 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388374 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/00 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
C09D5/18 (EP,US);
B05D5/00 (EP,US);
C09D7/43 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKVERFAHREN FÜR WÄRMEDÄMMBESCHICHTUNG | [2004/07] | English: | METHOD OF FINISHING WITH HEAT INSULATION COATING | [2004/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE FINITION AVEC UN REVETEMENT D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2003 | Translation filed | 05.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 20.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0026388 (BASF FARBEN & FASERN [DE]); | [A]US4413026 (SHERNO STANLEY A [US]); | [A]US4666960 (SPAIN RAYMOND G [US]); | [X]US6214450 (WICKERT FRANK A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 57 - column 7, line 67 * | International search | [A]JPS536340 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01289877 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK); | [Y]JPH0342075 (IG TECH RES INC); | [Y]JPH10265722 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000153570 (YAMAMOTO YOGYO KAKO KK); | [Y]JP2001040290 (KIKUSUI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) |