EP1380193 - A METHOD FOR FORMING A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD AND A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD FORMED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gul Technologies Singapore Ltd. 149-A Gul Circle Singapore 629606 / SG | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUA, Ah, Lim BLK 326, 04-1348 Yishun Ring Road S ingapore 760326 / SG | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Repkow, Ines, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte PartG mbB Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Repkow, Ines, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02708931.7 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002SG00050 | Priority number, date | SG20010002200 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: SG 200102200 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02087294 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380193 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00, H05K3/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H05K3/4611 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K1/0263 (EP,US);
H05K1/0265 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09672 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09736 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE UND DADURCH HERGESTELLTE LEITERPLATTE | [2004/03] | English: | A METHOD FOR FORMING A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD AND A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD FORMED THEREBY | [2004/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME ET CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME AINSI FABRIQUEE | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3325733 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,12 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 29 * * column 6, lines 27-63; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US3593107 (CHILTON GEORGE E, et al) [X] 1-13 * column 3, lines 5-32 * * column 4, lines 1-31; figures 3,7-9 *; | [A]US5767753 (RUELKE CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1-30* column 7, lines 23-63; figures 10,11 *; | [X] - "PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD WITH DENSE VARIABLE WIRING CAPACITY", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19900501), vol. 32, no. 12, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 188 - 189, XP000105322 [X] 1-30 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6068782 (BRANDT LUTZ W [US], et al); | [A]US5010641 (SISLER JOHN R [US]); | [A]US5261153 (LUCAS GREGORY L [US]) |