EP1358520 - LAMP POWER PULSE MODULATION IN COLOR SEQUENTIAL PROJECTION DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2010/23] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Infocus Corporation 27700B SW Parkway Avenue Willsonville, OR 97070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Steven, E. 12405 SW Foothill Drive Portland, OR 97225 / US | 02 /
PRUETT, Henry, Frazier 36929 Eldridge Drive Sandy, OR 97055 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02709026.5 | 14.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002US00969 | Priority number, date | US20010778225 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: US 778225 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063391 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358520 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358520 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/14, H04N9/12 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H04N9/3114 (EP,US);
G03B21/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMPENLEISTUNGSIMPULSMODULATION IN SEQUENTIELLEN FARBPROJEKTIONSANZEIGEN | [2003/45] | English: | LAMP POWER PULSE MODULATION IN COLOR SEQUENTIAL PROJECTION DISPLAYS | [2003/45] | French: | MODULATION D'IMPULSIONS DE PUISSANCE DE LAMPE DANS DES SYSTEMES D'AFFICHAGE COULEUR SEQUENTIEL PAR PROJECTION | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | BE | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
BE | 09.03.2011 | ||
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 09.03.2011 | |
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9724871 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-9* page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 8 *; | [Y]US5706061 (MARSHALL STEPHEN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 8, line 66 - column 10, line 29 * | International search | [X]US5706061 (MARSHALL STEPHEN W [US], et al); | [Y]US6054832 (KUNZMAN ADAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US6155687 (PETERSON MARK [US]) |