EP1409006 - MONODISPERSED MIXTURES AND METHODS OF TREATING DIABETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/17] | METHODS OF TREATING DIABETES MELLITUS | ||
[2010/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biocon Limited 20th K.M. Hosur Road, Electronics City P.O. Bangalore 560 100 Karnataka / IN | [2006/33] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Nobex Corporation Post Office Box 13940 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709-3940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKWURIBE, Nnochiri, N. 216 Coltsgate Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
PRICE, Christopher, H. 200 Commons Way Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | 03 /
STILL, James, Gordon 4816 Oak Way Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 04 /
FILBEY, Jennifer, Ann 5021 Tallwood Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 05 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Balasingam 209 Faison Road Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | 06 /
ODENBAUGH, Amy, L. 4023 Quail High Blvd. Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 07 /
ANSARI, Aslam, M. 19651 Club Lake Road Montgomery Village, MD 20886 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington & Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02709541.3 | 14.02.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US04440 | Priority number, date | US20010269198P | 15.02.2001 Original published format: US 269198 P | US20020347713P | 11.01.2002 Original published format: US 347713 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065985 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1409006 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409006 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, C07K14/62, A61K47/48 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/542 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | A61K38/28, C07K14/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | 03.09.2003 | LT | 03.09.2003 | LV | 03.09.2003 | MK | 03.09.2003 | RO | 03.09.2003 | SI | 03.09.2003 | Title | German: | MONODISPERSE MISCHUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES | [2010/32] | English: | MONODISPERSED MIXTURES AND METHODS OF TREATING DIABETES | [2010/32] | French: | MÉLANGES MONODISPERSÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU DIABÈTE | [2010/32] |
Former [2004/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES MELLITUS | ||
Former [2004/17] | METHODS OF TREATING DIABETES MELLITUS | ||
Former [2004/17] | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE SUCRE | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 22.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0043034 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 8, line 17 - line 24 *; | [DY]WO0078302 (PROTEIN DELIVERY INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-21 * claims 1.8.15,19,23 *; | [DE]WO02098446 (NOBEX CORP [US], et al) [DE] 1-21 * claims 1,31,85 *; | [DE]WO02098232 (NOBEX CORP [US], et al) [DE] 1-21 * claims 1,32,36 *; | [E]WO03022996 (NOBEX CORP [US], et al) [E] 1 * claim - *; | [E]WO03022208 (NOBEX CORP [US], et al) [E] 1 * claims 1,27,46 *; | [E]WO03022210 (NOBEX CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-21* claims 1,37 * | International search | [Y]US4179337 (DAVIS FRANK F [US], et al); | [Y]US5889153 (SUZUKI YOSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]US5922675 (BAKER JEFFREY C [US], et al); | [XP]US6309633 (EKWURIBE NNOCHIRI [US], et al) | Examination | - STILL ET AL, "Effects of orally active modified insulin in type I diabetic patients (OIII-B-3)", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (200102), vol. 69, no. 2, pages P95 - P95, XP001041778 | - HANDOUT FOR ORAL PRESENTATION, J. Gordon Still, "Effects of orally active modified insulin in type I diabetic patients" (March 2001) |