EP1366478 - REMAINING LIFE PREDICTION FOR FIELD DEVICE ELECTRONICS BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2003/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROME, Gregory, H. 7938 Heinback Trail Woodburg, MN 55125 / US | 02 /
ERYUREK, Evren 4952 York Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | 03 /
KAVAKLIOGLU, Kadir 8607 Shiloh Court Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | [2004/18] |
Former [2003/49] | 01 /
ROME, Gregory, H. 7938 Heinback Trail Woodburg, MN 55125 / US | ||
02 /
ERYUREK, Evren 4952 York Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55410 / US | |||
03 /
KAVAKLIOGLU, Kadir 5837 Fairfax Avenue Edina, MN 55424 / US | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02709773.2 | 05.03.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002US06606 | Priority number, date | US20010799824 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: US 799824 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02071362 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1366478 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366478 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G08C19/02 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
G01R31/2829 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/49] | G08C19/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/40] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE DER VERBLEIBENDEN LEBENSDAUER EINER FELDGERÄT-ELEKTRONIKSCHALTUNG | [2003/49] | English: | REMAINING LIFE PREDICTION FOR FIELD DEVICE ELECTRONICS BOARD | [2003/49] | French: | PREDICTION DE LA DUREE DE VIE DES CARTES ELECTRONIQUES D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TERRAIN | [2009/39] |
Former [2003/49] | PREDICTION DE LA DUREE DE VIE DES CARTES ELECTRONIQUES D'EMETTEURS A BASE DE MICROPROCESSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.05.2010 | [2011/35] | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19905071 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,10,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5654869 (OHI MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,10,13 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 20; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5216226 (MIYOSHI KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1,4,10,13 * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 14; figures 3,8-12 *; | [A]JPH08102241 ; | [DA]US5481200 (VOEGELE KEVIN D [US], et al) [DA] 1,10,13 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, line 45 - line 48; figure 1 *; | [A]US5629870 (FARAG SAMIR F [US], et al) [A] 11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08102241 A 19960416 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,10,13 * abstract * |