EP1388049 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRESENTING AND MANAGING INFORMATION IN AN AUTOMATED PARKING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haag, Gerhard 12812 N. 60th St. Clearwater, FL 33760 / US | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich & Co 34 New Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5AT / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich & Co 34 New Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5AT / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Schlich, George William, et al HLBBshaw Shaw House Pegler Way Crawley RH11 7AF / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Schlich, George William HLBBshaw Shaw House Pegler Way Crawley RH11 7AF / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/07] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02709864.9 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US08536 | Priority number, date | US20010812416 | 20.03.2001 Original published format: US 812416 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075520 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388049 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/42 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
E04H6/422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÄSENTIEREN UND VERWALTEN VON INFORMATIONEN IN EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN PARKSTRUKTUR | [2004/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRESENTING AND MANAGING INFORMATION IN AN AUTOMATED PARKING STRUCTURE | [2004/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REPRESENTER ET GERER DES INFORMATIONS DANS UNE STRUCTURE DE PARKING AUTOMATIQUE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9301567 (SCHICK PHILIPPE [CH]) [X] 1,14,27,28 * page 5, line 21 - page 16, line 24; figure 1 * [A] 2-26; | [A]US5281069 (TSUJIMOTO KAZUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-28* column 5, line 39 - column 14, line 16; figures 4-12 *; | [XA]US5432508 (JACKSON WAYNE B [US]) [X] 14,17 * column 3, line 57 - column 12, line 36; figures 1-9 * [A] 1-13,15-26,28; | [XA]US5737710 (ANTHONYSON ROBERT B [US]) [X] 14,27 * the whole document * [A] 1-13,15-26,28; | [XA]WO0046068 (HALL BRETT [US]) [X] 1,14,27,28 * page 5, line 8 - page 15, line 4; figures 1-3,7,9 * [A] 2-13,15-26 | International search | [A]US5383757 (TAKAOKA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US6085124 (CHOI DONG JIN [KR]); | [A]US6147624 (CLAPPER EDWARD O [US]) |